Other Information:William received his medical education at Trinity College, Dublin, qualifying L.R.C.P. & S.I., in 1864. He joined the medical services at the rank of Surgeon on 30th September 1864, then served with 73 Foot Regiment from 11th April 1865. On 30th September 1876 he gained promotion to the rank of Surgeon Major. He saw service in Afghan from 1878 to 1880 and again in Soudan from 1884 to 1885. On 7th November 1889 was promoted to the rank of Lieutenant Colonel, then again on 27th February 1895 to the rank of Colonel. On 1st December 1898 he gained the rank of Surgeon General, then retired on 11th August 1903. William was re-employed on 24th February 1915 due to the outbreak of war, and from April 1915 served with the War Officer as Inspector of hospitals, with an objective of bringing to notice of the officers in charge of hospitals the names of all patients who at the time of his visit were considered fit to be discharged.
|