Other Information:Arthur received his medical education at Manchester University, entering in 1900, he qualified M.B., B.Ch. in 1906. On 27th July 1907 he joined the Indian Medical Services, at the rank of Lieutenant and served in India from 1908 to 1913, during which time he gained promotion to the rank of Captain on 27th July 1910. On 29th July 1913 he transferred to serve with the R.A.M.C., joining at the rank of Captain. Arthur was stationed in Bordon when war was declared. He disembarked for France, with the British Expeditionary Force, on 14th August 1914 as the Regimental Medical Officer to the 1st Bn. Gloucestershire Regiment. He was invalided in 1915 but returned to the Western Front in 1916. On 3rd June 1919 he gained promotion to the rank of Brevet Major, becoming Major on 29th July 1919. He returned to India in 1921, serving there until 1922 when he was again invalided. He was put on half pay due to ill health on 23rd August 1922. Restored to full pay on 4th March 1924, Arthur was posted to Egypt, serving there from 1925 to 1926. He retired with pay on 30th July 1928, and ceased to be on the Roll of Officers on 28th July 1935.
|